MI SB0009 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Assigned Pa 0052'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Assigned Pa 0052'15 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family law; child custody; requirement to file motion for change of custody order when parent is called to active military duty; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.27). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4071'15, HB 4482'15
Title
Family law; child custody; requirement to file motion for change of custody order when parent is called to active military duty; modify. Amends sec. 7 of 1970 PA 91 (MCL 722.27). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4071'15, HB 4482'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 243 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 71 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 71 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0052'15 With Immediate Effect |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/9/2015 @ 4:22 Pm |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Approved By Governor 6/8/2015 @ 12:24 Pm |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Presented To Governor 6/4/2015 @ 11:18 Am |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 243 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | House Substitute H-1 Concurred In |
2015-05-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2015-05-26 | House | Title Amended |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 195 Yeas 110 Nays 0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2015-05-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-26 | House | Received On 03/26/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 71 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Substitute S-2 Concurred In |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Rick Jones |
Same As/Similar To
HB4071 (Same As) 2015-06-10 - Assigned Pa 50'15 With Immediate Effect