MI SB0008 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0003'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Pa 0003'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; supplemental appropriations in the school aid act for fiscal years 2021-2022 and 2022-2023; provide for. Amends secs. 11, 22b, 31f, 39a, 51a, 51c, 53a, 54 & 147c of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; supplemental appropriations in the school aid act for fiscal years 2021-2022 and 2022-2023; provide for. Amends secs. 11, 22b, 31f, 39a, 51a, 51c, 53a, 54 & 147c of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 74 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 6 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 6 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Assigned Pa 0003'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/14/2023 12:11 Pm |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Approved By Governor 02/14/2023 10:00 Am |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Presented To Governor 02/01/2023 12:24 Pm |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Given Immediate Effect |
2023-01-26 | House | Returned To Senate |
2023-01-26 | House | Inserted Full Title |
2023-01-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 Yeas 74 Nays 34 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2023-01-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-01-26 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-01-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-01-26 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2023-01-26 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-01-26 | House | Rule Suspended |
2023-01-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-01-18 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-01-18 | House | Received On 01/18/2023 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 6 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |