MI SB0001 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Assigned Pa 0021'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes. Amends secs. 150, 224, 1244, 2038, 2040, 2069, 2105, 2106, 2108, 2111, 2118, 2120, 2151, 3009, 3101, 3101a, 3104, 3107, 3109a, 3111, 3112, 3113, 3114, 3115, 3135, 3142, 3145, 3148, 3151, 3157, 3163, 3172, 3173a, 3174, 3175 & 3177 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.150 et seq.) & adds secs. 261, 271, 2013a, 2111f, 2116b, 2162, 3107c, 3107d, 3107e, 3157a & 3157b & chs. 31A and 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; no-fault; coverage and benefits; make miscellaneous changes. Amends secs. 150, 224, 1244, 2038, 2040, 2069, 2105, 2106, 2108, 2111, 2118, 2120, 2151, 3009, 3101, 3101a, 3104, 3107, 3109a, 3111, 3112, 3113, 3114, 3115, 3135, 3142, 3145, 3148, 3151, 3157, 3163, 3172, 3173a, 3174, 3175 & 3177 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.150 et seq.) & adds secs. 261, 271, 2013a, 2111f, 2116b, 2162, 3107c, 3107d, 3107e, 3157a & 3157b & chs. 31A and 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 122 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 122 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 105 (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 60 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAssigned Pa 0021'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-12SenateFiled With Secretary Of State 06/11/2019 03:22 Pm
2019-06-12SenateApproved By Governor 05/30/2019 10:23 Am
2019-05-24SenatePresented To Governor 05/29/2019 12:40 Pm
2019-05-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-05-24SenateTitle Amendment Agreed To
2019-05-24SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-05-24SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 122 Yeas 34 Nays 4 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-24SenateHouse Substitute (s-1) To Senate Substitute (h-3) Concurred In
2019-05-07SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2019-05-24HouseTitle Amended
2019-05-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 105 Yeas 94 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-05-24HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-24HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-05-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-24HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended
2019-05-24HouseSubstitute (h-1) Not Adopted
2019-05-24HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-16HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-16HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-05-23HouseReferred To Committee On Select Committee On Reducing Car Insurance Rates
2019-05-07HouseRead A First Time
2019-05-07HouseReceived On 05/08/2019
2019-05-07SenatePassed Roll Call # 60 Yeas 24 Nays 14 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-07SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2019-05-07SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-05-07SenateRules Suspended
2019-05-07SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
2019-05-07SenateSubstitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
2019-05-07SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
2019-05-07SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-05-07SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-01-15SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance And Banking
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced By Senator Aric Nesbitt

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-SB-0001
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/Senate/htm/2019-SIB-0001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBS-0001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/Senate/htm/2019-SEBH-0001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/Senate/htm/2019-SNB-0001.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-07-043.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-16-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-24-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-24-052.htm

Bill Comments

feedback