MI HCR0052 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-28 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to approve certain designated open space land applications for property in Kent County.
Title
A concurrent resolution to approve certain designated open space land applications for property in Kent County.
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] | Sen. Bill Hardiman [R] | Sen. Dave Hildenbrand [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] |
Rep. Jeff Mayes [D] | Sen. Arlan Meekhof [R] | Rep. Tom Pearce [R] | Sen. Jim Stamas [R] |
Rep. John Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-28 | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record | |
2010-07-28 | Adopted | |
2010-07-21 | Placed On Order Of Resolutions | |
2010-07-21 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-05-25 | Referred To Committee On Agriculture And Bioeconomy | |
2010-05-25 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-20 | Adopted And Transmitted | |
2010-05-12 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced By Representative Dave Hildenbrand |