MI HCR0049 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-11)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to urge the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Council to scrutinize carefully the proposed diversion at Waukesha, Wisconsin.
Title
A concurrent resolution to urge the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Council to scrutinize carefully the proposed diversion at Waukesha, Wisconsin.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-05-11 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-04 | Adopted As Substituted S-1 | |
2010-05-04 | Substitute S-1 Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Placed On Order Of Resolutions | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-04-14 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-14 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-04-13 | Adopted And Transmitted | |
2010-03-25 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Committee On Great Lakes And Environment | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced By Representative Rebekah Warren |