MI HCR0032 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-21 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to remind state employees of whistleblower protections and encourage them to come forward if they have knowledge of any irregularities or illegal or suspect behavior.
Title
A concurrent resolution to remind state employees of whistleblower protections and encourage them to come forward if they have knowledge of any irregularities or illegal or suspect behavior.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-21 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-12-16 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-16 | House | Adopted |
2020-12-15 | House | Postponed Temporarily |
2020-12-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |