MI HCR0024 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-21 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to demand that the Governor compile and make publicly available certain data, to encourage medical professionals to provide elective medical procedures, and to encourage the people of Michigan to continue to practice safe social distancing.
Title
A concurrent resolution to demand that the Governor compile and make publicly available certain data, to encourage medical professionals to provide elective medical procedures, and to encourage the people of Michigan to continue to practice safe social distancing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 250 (Y: 69 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted |
2020-06-18 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 250 Yeas 69 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-06-18 | House | Adopted |
2020-06-18 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-05-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-05-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Luke Meerman |