MI HCR0013 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution relative to secondary road patrol funds for counties providing road patrol services to cities and villages.
Title
A concurrent resolution relative to secondary road patrol funds for counties providing road patrol services to cities and villages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 274 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 273 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 274 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 273 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-10 | House | Adopted By Senate - Referred To The Clerk For Record |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Resolutions |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2017-09-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-09-20 | House | Roll Call # 274 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2017-09-20 | House | Adopted |
2017-09-20 | House | Vote Reconsidered |
2017-09-20 | House | Roll Call # 273 Yeas 106 Nays 0 |
2017-09-20 | House | Adopted |
2017-09-20 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-09-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2017-09-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |