MI HCR0011 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-4)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to memorialize Congress to adopt and present to the states for ratification an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to establish fundamental parental rights.
Title
A concurrent resolution to memorialize Congress to adopt and present to the states for ratification an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to establish fundamental parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 410 (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-12 | House | Transmitted |
2012-06-12 | House | Roll Call # 410 Yeas 71 Nays 39 |
2012-06-12 | House | Adopted |
2012-02-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2011-05-04 | House | Introduced By Representative Dave Agema |