MI HB6400 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 513'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-31 - Assigned Pa 513'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Land use; zoning and growth management; Michigan zoning enabling act; exempt certain adult care facilities from special or conditional use permits. Amends sec. 206 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3206).
Title
Land use; zoning and growth management; Michigan zoning enabling act; exempt certain adult care facilities from special or conditional use permits. Amends sec. 206 of 2006 PA 110 (MCL 125.3206).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-20 - House - House Third Reading: Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 959 (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 863 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 679 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 863 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 679 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 513'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/28/2018 @ 1:36 Pm |
2018-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/27/2018 @ 3:49 Pm 12/31/18 Addenda |
2018-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/26/2018 @ 7:18 Pm |
2018-12-20 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-20 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-20 | House | Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 959 Yeas 105 Nays 2 |
2018-12-20 | House | Rule Suspended |
2018-12-20 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-12-20 | House | Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 863 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) Concurred In |
2018-12-18 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Amendment(s) |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2018-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 679 Yeas 106 Nays 2 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-11-29 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-11-29 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-09-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2018 |
2018-09-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2018-09-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-09-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Noble |