MI HB6279 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Notice Given To Discharge Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Education: financing; funding for implementation of a “Michigan kids back on track program” and other costs associated with the implementation; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611) & adds secs. 23f & 23g.
Title
Education: financing; funding for implementation of a “Michigan kids back on track program” and other costs associated with the implementation; provide for. Amends sec. 11 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1611) & adds secs. 23f & 23g.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2022-09-21 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Postponed For Day |
2022-06-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/28/2022 |
2022-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2022-06-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Haadsma |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2022-HB-6279 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2022-HIB-6279.htm |