MI HB6258 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; credit cards; crimes involving credit cards; include cryptocurrency and distributed ledger technology in definition section of credit chapter in penal code. Amends sec. 157m of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157m).
Title
Crimes; credit cards; crimes involving credit cards; include cryptocurrency and distributed ledger technology in definition section of credit chapter in penal code. Amends sec. 157m of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.157m).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 694 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2018-12-05 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 694 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2018-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-08-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/12/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-06-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-06-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Vanessa Guerra |