MI HB6192 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-27 - Referred To Committee On Oversight
Pending: Senate Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources: hunting; department of natural resources' ability to issue orders suspending an open season for fish, game, or fur-bearing animals; repeal. Repeals sec. 41103 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.41103).
Title
Natural resources: hunting; department of natural resources' ability to issue orders suspending an open season for fish, game, or fur-bearing animals; repeal. Repeals sec. 41103 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.41103).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-09-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-09-21 | House | Transmitted |
2022-09-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 407 Yeas 58 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 9 |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-09-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-09-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-06-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-06-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-06-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/09/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2022-06-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-06-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |