MI HB6188 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mental health: other; state-operated registries related to mental health; require to report data to the Michigan crisis and access line. Amends sec. 165 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1165).
Title
Mental health: other; state-operated registries related to mental health; require to report data to the Michigan crisis and access line. Amends sec. 165 of 1974 PA 258 (MCL 330.1165).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2020-09-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 09/09/2020 |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Mary Whiteford |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2020-HB-6188 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2020-HIB-6188.htm |