MI HB6122 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Assigned Pa 172'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Assigned Pa 172'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Courts: funding; fund shift for the juror compensation reimbursement fund; provide for. Amends sec. 151d of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.151d).
Title
Courts: funding; fund shift for the juror compensation reimbursement fund; provide for. Amends sec. 151d of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.151d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Assigned Pa 172'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/01/2020 12:08 Pm |
2020-10-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/01/2020 11:09 Am |
2020-09-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/24/2020 01:20 Pm |
2020-09-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 304 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-09-09 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 360 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2020 |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Lori Stone |
Subjects
Courts: funding
Courts: juries
State financing and management: budget
State financing and management: funds
Courts: juries
State financing and management: budget
State financing and management: funds