MI HB6118 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Assigned Pa 167'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Assigned Pa 167'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: presidential primary; deadline to submit verified account of actual costs of conducting a presidential primary election; extend for March 2020 presidential primary election. Amends sec. 624g of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.624g).
Title
Elections: presidential primary; deadline to submit verified account of actual costs of conducting a presidential primary election; extend for March 2020 presidential primary election. Amends sec. 624g of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.624g).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Assigned Pa 167'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-09-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 09/30/2020 02:38 Pm |
2020-09-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 09/30/2020 01:22 Pm |
2020-09-24 | House | Presented To The Governor 09/24/2020 01:14 Pm |
2020-09-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-09-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-09-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 301 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-09-09 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 356 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-09-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-01 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/17/2020 |
2020-08-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2020-08-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-08-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Roger Hauck |