MI HB6101 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 239'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Assigned Pa 239'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Labor: health and safety; protection from liability related to an employee's exposure to COVID-19; provide for a definition of COVID-19. Amends 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1001 - 408.1094) by adding sec. 85a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6032'20, HB 6031'20, HB 6030'20
Title
Labor: health and safety; protection from liability related to an employee's exposure to COVID-19; provide for a definition of COVID-19. Amends 1974 PA 154 (MCL 408.1001 - 408.1094) by adding sec. 85a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 6032'20, HB 6031'20, HB 6030'20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 489 (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 (Y: 61 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | House | Assigned Pa 239'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-10-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/22/2020 12:26 Pm |
2020-10-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/22/2020 11:40 Am |
2020-10-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/16/2020 01:58 Pm |
2020-10-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-10-14 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 489 Yeas 88 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 8 |
2020-10-14 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-14 | House | Rule Suspended |
2020-10-14 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-10-14 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 Yeas 29 Nays 8 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2020-10-13 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic And Small Business Development |
2020-09-23 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-23 | House | Title Amended |
2020-09-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 404 Yeas 61 Nays 45 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-09-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-22 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-09-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-09-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-08-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 08/06/2020 |
2020-08-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-08-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-08-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Wendell Byrd |