MI HB6079 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:30 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:30 Pm
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of I-75; designate as the "Officer Jessica Nagle-Wilson Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 35a.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of I-75; designate as the "Officer Jessica Nagle-Wilson Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 35a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 285 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 285 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/19/2022 12:30 Pm |
2022-07-01 | House | Assigned Pa 165'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-07-01 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/19/2022 10:08 Am |
2022-07-01 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2022 01:20 Pm |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 376 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-06-07 | House | Transmitted |
2022-06-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 285 Yeas 107 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-06-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2022-05-10 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-05 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2022-05-05 | House | Read A First Time |
2022-05-05 | House | Introduced By Representative Regina Weiss |