MI HB5977 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans
Pending: Senate Families, Seniors And Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Children: child care; grace period for child care providers to implement new rules; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.112).
Title
Children: child care; grace period for child care providers to implement new rules; provide for. Amends sec. 2 of 1973 PA 116 (MCL 722.112).
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Markkanen [R] | Rep. Kathy Crawford [R] | Rep. Jack O'Malley [R] | Rep. Douglas Wozniak [R] |
Rep. Pauline Wendzel [R] | Sen. Joseph Bellino [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 (Y: 57 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors, And Veterans |
2020-12-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-12-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 505 Yeas 57 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 |
2020-12-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-11-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-11-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-11-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-11-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2020-09-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2020-07-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 07/22/2020 |
2020-07-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2020-07-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-07-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Gregory Markkanen |