MI HB5888 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Assigned Pa 163'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Assigned Pa 163'10 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; state police; department of state police; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations; state police; department of state police; provide for fiscal year 2010-2011. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Assigned Pa 163'10 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-09-23 | Filed With Secretary Of State 9/23/2010 @ 1:37 Pm | |
2010-09-23 | Approved By The Governor 9/23/2010 @ 9:42 Am | |
2010-09-21 | Presented To The Governor 9/17/2010 @ 2:18 Pm | |
2010-09-15 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | |
2010-09-15 | Conference Report Adopted By Senate | |
2010-09-15 | Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 411 Yeas 35 Nays 2 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-09-15 | Conference Report Received In Senate | |
2010-09-14 | Retransmitted | |
2010-09-14 | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 374 Yeas 107 Nays 0 | |
2010-09-14 | Rule Suspended | |
2010-09-14 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-09-14 | Conference Report Received | |
2010-06-16 | Referred To Conference Committee 06/15/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Senate Conferees Named 06/15/2010: Sens. Valde Garcia Alan Cropsey James Barcia | |
2010-06-16 | Senate Named Conferees 06/15/2010: Sens. Valde Garcia, Alan Cropsey, James Barcia | |
2010-06-15 | House Conferees Named 06/11/2010: Reps. Richard Leblanc John Espinoza Bob Genetski | |
2010-05-25 | Roll Call # 212 Yeas 0 Nays 106 | |
2010-05-25 | Senate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In | |
2010-05-19 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | |
2010-05-19 | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-19 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 257 Yeas 37 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | |
2010-05-19 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-05-19 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-19 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-19 | Substitute S-1 Concurred In | |
2010-05-19 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-19 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-05-19 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-05-19 | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted | |
2010-03-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 127 Yeas 61 Nays 48 | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-03-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-3 Adopted And Amended | |
2010-03-25 | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-03-23 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-03-23 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 | |
2010-02-24 | Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-02-23 | Read A First Time | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced By Representative Richard Leblanc |
Same As/Similar To
SB1194 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - Referred To Committee On Appropriations