MI HB5880 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-24 - Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: offenses; felony for submitting an absent voter ballot application using another person’s name and personal information; create, and create a felony for submitting an absent voter ballot application with the intent to obtain multiple absent voter ballots for a person. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Title
Elections: offenses; felony for submitting an absent voter ballot application using another person’s name and personal information; create, and create a felony for submitting an absent voter ballot application with the intent to obtain multiple absent voter ballots for a person. Amends sec. 759 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.759).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2020-09-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-06-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/23/2020 |
2020-06-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2020-06-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-06-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Pauline Wendzel |