MI HB5817 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development: tax increment financing; tax increment financing act; amend to exempt museum authorities. Amends secs. 201, 301, 402, 523, 603, 703 & 803 of 2018 PA 57 (MCL 125.4201 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4177'23, HB 5818'24
Title
Economic development: tax increment financing; tax increment financing act; amend to exempt museum authorities. Amends secs. 201, 301, 402, 523, 603, 703 & 803 of 2018 PA 57 (MCL 125.4201 et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4177'23, HB 5818'24
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Transmitted |
2024-06-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 267 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2024-06-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-06-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-06-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-06-18 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/18/2024 |
2024-06-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2024-06-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-06-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |
Same As/Similar To
HB4177 (Same As) 2024-06-25 - Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
HB5818 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Transmitted
HB5818 (Same As) 2024-06-27 - Transmitted