MI HB5794 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 375'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 375'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; penalties; crime of aggravated production, financing, and distribution of child sexually abusive material; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 145g.
Title
Crimes; penalties; crime of aggravated production, financing, and distribution of child sexually abusive material; provide for. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 145g.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandt Iden [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 664 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Assigned Pa 375'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2018 @ 3:04 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 1:53 Pm |
2018-12-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/7/2018 @ 2:00 Pm |
2018-12-04 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-04 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-04 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 664 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 400 Yeas 106 Nays 3 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-04-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Brandt Iden |