MI HB5776 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy
Pending: Senate Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations; counselors; scope of practice for counselors; modify, and revise licensing requirements. Amends secs. 18101, 18107, 18111 & 18115 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.18101 et seq.) & adds sec. 18106.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations; counselors; scope of practice for counselors; modify, and revise licensing requirements. Amends secs. 18101, 18107, 18111 & 18115 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.18101 et seq.) & adds sec. 18106.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 767 (Y: 95 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-11SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-12-06HouseTransmitted
2018-12-06HouseTitle Amended
2018-12-06HousePassed Roll Call # 767 Yeas 95 Nays 14
2018-12-06HouseRead A Third Time
2018-12-06HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2018-12-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-12-06HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2018-12-06HouseRead A Second Time
2018-12-05HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-12-05HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2
2018-04-11HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 04/10/2018
2018-04-10HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2018-04-10HouseRead A First Time
2018-04-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Jim Tedder

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback