MI HB5768 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-12 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Military affairs; other; restriction of activities by Michigan national guard and state and local employees; provide for under certain circumstances. Creates new act.
Title
Military affairs; other; restriction of activities by Michigan national guard and state and local employees; provide for under certain circumstances. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Sen. James Ananich [D] | Rep. Frank Foster [R] | Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Rep. Gregory MacMaster [R] |
Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Rep. Thomas McMillin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-12-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 681 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-05 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 681 (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-09-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2012-12-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2012-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-12-05 | House | Transmitted |
2012-12-05 | House | Passed Roll Call # 681 Yeas 107 Nays 0 |
2012-12-05 | House | Read A Third Time |
2012-12-04 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2012-12-04 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2012-12-04 | House | Read A Second Time |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-11-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2012-09-12 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2012-09-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Oversight, Reform, And Ethics |
2012-07-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/15/2012 |
2012-06-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2012-06-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-06-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Mcmillin |