MI HB5766 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Assigned Pa 342'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Assigned Pa 342'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicles; equipment; use of amber lights on vehicles performing snow removal services; allow during movement between jobs, allow for operation of certain vehicles with snow plow blades up to 10 feet wide during certain periods, and other revisions. Amends secs. 224, 226, 698, 717 & 808 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224 et seq.).
Title
Vehicles; equipment; use of amber lights on vehicles performing snow removal services; allow during movement between jobs, allow for operation of certain vehicles with snow plow blades up to 10 feet wide during certain periods, and other revisions. Amends secs. 224, 226, 698, 717 & 808 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.224 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-02 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 588 (Y: 102 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | House | Assigned Pa 342'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-10-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/16/2018 @ 1:34 Pm |
2018-10-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 10/16/2018 @ 8:58 Am |
2018-10-04 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/4/2018 @ 10:04 Am |
2018-10-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-10-02 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2018-10-02 | House | Roll Call # 588 Yeas 102 Nays 4 |
2018-10-02 | House | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2018-09-27 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-09-27 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 585 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-4 |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2018-05-17 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 340 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2018-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2018-04-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-04-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |