MI HB5749 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-03 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Weapons; firearms; regulation of spring, gas, or air operated handguns; repeal. Repeals 1959 PA 186 (MCL 752.891 - 752.892).
Title
Weapons; firearms; regulation of spring, gas, or air operated handguns; repeal. Repeals 1959 PA 186 (MCL 752.891 - 752.892).
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Philip Potvin [R] |
Rep. Dale Zorn [R] | Sen. Peter MacGregor [R] | Rep. Joel Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 571 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 571 (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-11-12 | House | Transmitted |
2014-11-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 571 Yeas 102 Nays 6 |
2014-11-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-11-06 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-11-06 | House | Amended |
2014-11-06 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-10-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-09-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 09/10/2014 |
2014-09-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-09-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-09-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Pettalia |