MI HB5746 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 534'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Children; foster care; continued court jurisdiction under the young adult voluntary foster care act; allow. Amends sec. 29 of 2011 PA 225 (MCL 400.669).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; foster care; continued court jurisdiction under the young adult voluntary foster care act; allow. Amends sec. 29 of 2011 PA 225 (MCL 400.669).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 534'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 1/14/2015 @ 4:01 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 4:20 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 4:22 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-12-17HouseFull Title Agreed To
2014-12-17HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2014-12-17SenateInserted Full Title
2014-12-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 843 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-12-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2014-12-17SenateRules Suspended
2014-12-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2014-12-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2014-11-13SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2014-11-13SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-11-13SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2014-10-02SenateReferred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services
2014-10-01HouseTransmitted
2014-10-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 519 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2014-10-01HouseRead A Third Time
2014-09-24HousePlaced On Third Reading
2014-09-24HouseRead A Second Time
2014-09-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2014-09-17HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2014-09-10HousePrinted Bill Filed 09/10/2014
2014-09-09HouseReferred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors
2014-09-09HouseRead A First Time
2014-09-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Nancy Jenkins

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2014-HB-5746
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2014-HIB-5746.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBH-5746.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2014-HEBS-5746.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2014-HNB-5746.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-09-17-067.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-10-01-072.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-11-13-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-17-083.htm

Bill Comments

feedback