MI HB5727 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-13 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Courts; juries; increase in juror compensation; provide for. Amends sec. 151e of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.151e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'15
Title
Courts; juries; increase in juror compensation; provide for. Amends sec. 151e of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.151e). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4561'15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-13 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-09-13 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-06-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-06-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |