MI HB5715 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-01 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: certificate of need; certain regulatory requirements of health care facilities; suspend during a declared emergency. Amends secs. 20173a, 21564, 21911, 21913 & 22235 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20173a et seq) & adds secs. 20173c, 21564a, 21914 & 22235a.
Title
Health facilities: certificate of need; certain regulatory requirements of health care facilities; suspend during a declared emergency. Amends secs. 20173a, 21564, 21911, 21913 & 22235 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20173a et seq) & adds secs. 20173c, 21564a, 21914 & 22235a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-01 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-12-01 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2020-04-30 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/30/2020 |
2020-04-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2020-04-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2020-04-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Jason Sheppard |