MI HB5664 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-27 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; alcohol content for individuals operating a motor vehicle under the influence of alcoholic liquor in the code of criminal procedure; maintain at 0.08 without reversion to 0.10. Amends secs. 33 & 48, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.33 & 777.48). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5665'12
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; alcohol content for individuals operating a motor vehicle under the influence of alcoholic liquor in the code of criminal procedure; maintain at 0.08 without reversion to 0.10. Amends secs. 33 & 48, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.33 & 777.48). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5665'12
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Hughes [R] | Rep. Nancy Jenkins [R] | Rep. Andrea LaFontaine [R] | Rep. Matthew Lori [R] |
Rep. Pat Somerville [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-09-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Amendment(s) |
2012-05-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/24/2012 |
2012-05-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2012-05-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2012-05-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Pat Somerville |