MI HB5660 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 373'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-18 - Assigned Pa 373'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes; penalties; crime of aggravated possession of child sexually abusive material; provide increased penalty. Amends sec. 145c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145c).
Title
Crimes; penalties; crime of aggravated possession of child sexually abusive material; provide increased penalty. Amends sec. 145c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.145c).
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Love [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 662 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-18 | House | Assigned Pa 373'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-12-18 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2018 @ 3:00 Pm |
2018-12-18 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/17/2018 @ 10:38 Am |
2018-12-11 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/7/2018 @ 1:58 Pm |
2018-12-04 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-12-04 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-12-04 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 662 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 1 |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-05-24 | House | Transmitted |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 401 Yeas 107 Nays 2 |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2018-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-05-23 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-05-23 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/27/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-02-27 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced By Representative Leslie Love |