MI HB5656 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State financing and management: funds; corner store initiative grant program; provide for. Amends secs. 90a & 90b of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a & 125.2090b).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State financing and management: funds; corner store initiative grant program; provide for. Amends secs. 90a & 90b of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a & 125.2090b).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-12HouseReferred To Second Reading
2022-04-12HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-12-29HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 12/15/2021
2021-12-15HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2021-12-15HouseRead A First Time
2021-12-15HouseIntroduced By Representative Julie Rogers

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback