MI HB5656 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-02 - Recommendation Concurred In
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; housing discrimination; housing discrimination for domestic violence victims; prohibit. Amends sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502).
Title
Civil rights; housing discrimination; housing discrimination for domestic violence victims; prohibit. Amends sec. 502 of 1976 PA 453 (MCL 37.2502).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-02 | House | Recommendation Concurred In |
2014-10-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-06-12 | House | Printed Bill Filed 06/12/2014 |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2014-06-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-06-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Sam Singh |
Subjects
Civil rights, housing discrimination
Crime victims, other
Crimes, domestic violence
Housing, landlord and tenants
Crime victims, other
Crimes, domestic violence
Housing, landlord and tenants