MI HB5637 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; other; placement of youth under 18 with adults during confinement, trial, or transport; prohibit. Amends sec. 139 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.139).
Title
Corrections; other; placement of youth under 18 with adults during confinement, trial, or transport; prohibit. Amends sec. 139 of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.139).
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Durhal [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-02-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Fred Durhal |