MI HB5632 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-18 - Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Economic Development & Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance; other; provision to prohibit the commissioner of the office of financial and insurance regulation from working for entities regulated by the office for a period of 2 years after leaving office; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 203.
Title
Insurance; other; provision to prohibit the commissioner of the office of financial and insurance regulation from working for entities regulated by the office for a period of 2 years after leaving office; provide for. Amends 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.100 - 500.8302) by adding sec. 203.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-18 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Regulatory Reform | |
2009-12-16 | Transmitted | |
2009-12-16 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 641 Yeas 100 Nays 4 | |
2009-12-16 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-12-16 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-12-16 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-12-16 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-12-03 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-12-03 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-12-02 | Printed Bill Filed 12/02/2009 | |
2009-12-01 | Referred To Committee On Insurance | |
2009-12-01 | Read A First Time | |
2009-12-01 | Introduced By Representative Dan Scripps |