MI HB5629 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Highways: memorial; portion of M-24; designate as the "Orion Veterans Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 1078a.
Title
Highways: memorial; portion of M-24; designate as the "Orion Veterans Memorial Highway". Amends 2001 PA 142 (MCL 250.1001 - 250.2092) by adding sec. 1078a.
Sponsors
Rep. John Reilly [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 156 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-04-12 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-12-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/09/2021 |
2021-12-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2021-12-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced By Representative John Reilly |