MI HB5620 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Assigned Pa 167'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sales tax; exemptions; exemption claim process after sale at retail; modify. Amends sec. 12 of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.62).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax; exemptions; exemption claim process after sale at retail; modify. Amends sec. 12 of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.62).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 348 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseAssigned Pa 167'18 With Immediate Effect
2018-06-05HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/4/2018 @ 10:38 Am
2018-06-05HouseApproved By The Governor 6/3/2018 @ 8:29 Pm
2018-05-29HousePresented To The Governor 5/24/2018 @ 2:36 Pm
2018-05-22HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2018-05-22HouseFull Title Agreed To
2018-05-22House Roll Call # 348 Yeas 107 Nays 1
2018-05-22HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-05-17HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2018-05-17HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2018-05-17SenateInserted Full Title
2018-05-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 308 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2018-05-16SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2018-05-16SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2018-05-16SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-05-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2018-05-15SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2018-05-15SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2018-04-10SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2018-03-22HouseTransmitted
2018-03-22HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 197 Yeas 109 Nays 0
2018-03-22HouseRead A Third Time
2018-03-21HousePlaced On Third Reading
2018-03-21HouseSubstitute H-1 Adopted
2018-03-21HouseRead A Second Time
2018-03-14HouseReferred To Second Reading
2018-03-14HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2018-02-22HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2018
2018-02-21HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2018-02-21HouseRead A First Time
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2018-HB-5620
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2018-HIB-5620.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBH-5620.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2018-HEBS-5620.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2018-HNB-5620.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2018-PA-0167.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-14-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-03-22-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-15-048.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2018-SJ-05-17-050.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2018-HJ-05-22-051.htm

Bill Comments

feedback