MI HB5618 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 360'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-28 - Assigned Pa 360'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Education; discipline; requirements and procedures for suspension or expulsion; revise. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1310d.
Title
Education; discipline; requirements and procedures for suspension or expulsion; revise. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1310d.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Schor [D] | Rep. Adam Zemke [D] | Rep. Alton Pscholka [R] | Rep. Lisa Lyons [R] |
Sen. Jeff Irwin [D] | Sen. Peter Lucido [R] | Rep. David LaGrand [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 673 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 734 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 734 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 360'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/22/2016 @ 10:54 Am |
2016-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/21/2016 @ 7:48 Pm |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/20/2016 @ 4:22 Pm |
2016-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-14 | House | Roll Call # 673 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2016-12-14 | House | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2016-12-13 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2016-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 734 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2016-06-02 | House | Transmitted |
2016-06-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 368 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-06-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-06-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Substitute H-6 Adopted |
2016-06-01 | House | Substitute H-5 Not Adopted |
2016-06-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-05-26 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-5 |
2016-05-04 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/03/2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2016-05-03 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-05-03 | House | Introduced By Representative Andy Schor |