MI HB5616 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-07 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: medical examiners; requirements for an investigation of the cause and manner of death; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1953 PA 181 (MCL 52.202 & 52.203).
Title
Health: medical examiners; requirements for an investigation of the cause and manner of death; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1953 PA 181 (MCL 52.202 & 52.203).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2022-05-26 | House | Transmitted |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 278 Yeas 98 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2022-05-26 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-25 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2022-05-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-12-09 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 12/08/2021 |
2021-12-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-12-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-12-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter |