MI HB5579 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 265'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Assigned Pa 265'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; school aid; fiscal year 2018-2019 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Title
Appropriations; school aid; fiscal year 2018-2019 omnibus appropriations for school aid, higher education, and community colleges; provide for. Amends, adds & repeals (See bill).
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 483 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 371 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading: Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 483 (Y: 63 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 371 (Y: 0 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 315 (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | House | Assigned Pa 265'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-08-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/28/2018 @ 4:22 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/28/2018 @ 2:26 Pm |
2018-08-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/22/2018 @ 9:10 Am |
2018-06-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-12 | House | Conference Report Adopted By Senate With Immediate Effect |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Senate Adopted Conference Report With Immediate Effect Roll Call # 445 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Conference Report Received In Senate |
2018-06-12 | House | Retransmitted |
2018-06-12 | House | Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 483 Yeas 63 Nays 46 |
2018-06-12 | House | Conference Report Received |
2018-05-24 | House | Referred To Conference Committee 05/24/2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Conferees Named 05/24/2018: Sens. David Hildenbrand Arlan Meekhof Vincent Gregory |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Named Conferees 05/24/2018: Sens. David Hildenbrand, Arlan Meekhof, Vincent Gregory |
2018-05-23 | House | House Conferees Named 05/23/2018: Reps. Tim Kelly Laura Cox Robert Kosowski |
2018-05-23 | House | Roll Call # 371 Yeas 0 Nays 109 |
2018-05-23 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Nonconcurred In |
2018-05-22 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2018-05-22 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Title Amendment |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 26 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-04-24 | House | Transmitted |
2018-04-24 | House | Title Amended |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 Yeas 71 Nays 36 |
2018-04-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2018-04-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2018-04-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed On Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2018-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Tim Kelly |
Subjects
Appropriations: community colleges
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: school aid
Higher education: other
School aid: fiscal year appropriations
Appropriations: higher education
Appropriations: school aid
Higher education: other
School aid: fiscal year appropriations