MI HB5551 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 219'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Assigned Pa 219'16 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control; driver license; definition of veteran on driver license; revise. Amends sec. 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.310). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5332'16
Title
Traffic control; driver license; definition of veteran on driver license; revise. Amends sec. 310 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.310). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5332'16
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Assigned Pa 219'16 With Immediate Effect |
2016-07-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/22/2016 @ 2:46 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/21/2016 @ 9:32 Pm |
2016-07-13 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/21/2016 @ 10:30 Am |
2016-06-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-06-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 410 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Veterans, Military Affairs And Homeland Security |
2016-05-10 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-10 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 232 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-04-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/13/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |