MI HB5550 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-26 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: recall; meeting requirements to review recall petitions; modify. Amends secs. 951a & 952 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.951a & 168.952).
Title
Elections: recall; meeting requirements to review recall petitions; modify. Amends secs. 951a & 952 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.951a & 168.952).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-06-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2024-03-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/06/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2024-03-06 | House | Read A First Time |
2024-03-06 | House | Introduced By Representative Penelope Tsernoglou |