MI HB5547 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-10 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crimes involving the provision of raw human milk for human consumption; provide for. Amends sec. 12m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4206'15
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for crimes involving the provision of raw human milk for human consumption; provide for. Amends sec. 12m, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.12m). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4206'15
Sponsors
Rep. George Darany [D] | Sen. Erika Geiss [D] | Rep. Leslie Love [D] | Rep. Sarah Roberts [D] |
Rep. Pam Faris [D] | Rep. Latanya Garrett [D] | Sen. Stephanie Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/13/2016 |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2016-04-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced By Representative George Darany |