MI HB5532 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 146'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Assigned Pa 146'18 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; personal protection orders; criminal sexual conduct; prohibit abuser from attending same school as minor victim. Amends secs. 2950 & 2950a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2950 & 600.2950a).
Title
Civil procedure; personal protection orders; criminal sexual conduct; prohibit abuser from attending same school as minor victim. Amends secs. 2950 & 2950a of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2950 & 600.2950a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Assigned Pa 146'18 With Immediate Effect |
2018-05-10 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/10/2018 @ 11:06 Am |
2018-05-10 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:52 Pm |
2018-05-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/2/2018 @ 9:52 Am |
2018-04-26 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-04-26 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-04-26 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 235 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2018-03-08 | House | Transmitted |
2018-03-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-03-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 148 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2018-03-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2018-02-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/08/2018 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2018-02-08 | House | Read A First Time |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced By Representative Sylvia Santana |
Subjects
Civil procedure: personal protection orders
Crimes: crimes against minors
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct
Crimes: crimes against minors
Crimes: criminal sexual conduct