MI HB5532 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/05/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Food; other; morel mushroom buyers; eliminate requirement to be certified. Amends sec. 6101 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.6101).
Title
Food; other; morel mushroom buyers; eliminate requirement to be certified. Amends sec. 6101 of 2000 PA 92 (MCL 289.6101).
Sponsors
Rep. Triston Cole [R] | Sen. Jon Bumstead [R] | Sen. Dan Lauwers [R] | Rep. Bruce Rendon [R] |
Rep. Philip Potvin [R] | Rep. Ray Franz [R] | Rep. Peter Pettalia [R] | Rep. Lee Chatfield [R] |
Rep. Scott Dianda [D] | Rep. Larry Inman [R] | Sen. Ed McBroom [R] | Rep. John Kivela [D] |
Rep. Joel Johnson [R] | Rep. Gary Glenn [R] | Rep. Joseph Graves [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] |
Rep. Aaron Miller [R] | Rep. Robert Kosowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 818 (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 (Y: 57 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-31 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 01/05/2017 |
2016-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/27/2016 @ 12:40 Pm |
2016-12-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2016-12-15 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2016-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Immediate Effect Defeated |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 818 Yeas 26 Nays 11 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2016-05-31 | House | Transmitted |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 336 Yeas 57 Nays 52 |
2016-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-04-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-04-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2016-04-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/12/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2016-04-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2016-04-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Triston Cole |