MI HB5511 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-22 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-22 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil procedure; other; collection of court-ordered financial obligations from judgments against the state; allow. Amends sec. 6458 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6458).
Title
Civil procedure; other; collection of court-ordered financial obligations from judgments against the state; allow. Amends sec. 6458 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.6458).
Sponsors
Rep. Michael McCready [R] | Rep. Tim Kelly [R] | Rep. Ben Glardon [R] | Rep. Kenneth Kurtz [R] |
Rep. Thomas Hooker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-22 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 (Y: 105 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-10-22 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2014-09-17 | House | Transmitted |
2014-09-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 468 Yeas 105 Nays 3 |
2014-09-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-09-09 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-09-09 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2014-09-09 | House | Substitute H-1 Not Adopted |
2014-09-09 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2014-05-06 | House | Printed Bill Filed 05/02/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2014-05-01 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-05-01 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Mccready |