MI HB5493 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 475'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Assigned Pa 475'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation; motor carrier fuel tax; flat tax rate; eliminate, and establish an 18-month limitation period for filing refund claims. Amends secs. 2 & 6a of 1980 PA 119 (MCL 207.212 & 207.216a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5477'14
Title
Transportation; motor carrier fuel tax; flat tax rate; eliminate, and establish an 18-month limitation period for filing refund claims. Amends secs. 2 & 6a of 1980 PA 119 (MCL 207.212 & 207.216a). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5477'14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 922 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 781 (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 446 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-19 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 781 (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Defeated Roll Call # 446 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 (Y: 84 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-31 | House | Assigned Pa 475'14 With Immediate Effect 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 1/12/2015 @ 3:46 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Approved By The Governor 1/10/2015 @ 12:38 Pm 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-31 | House | Presented To The Governor 1/7/2015 @ 11:56 Am 2014 Addenda |
2014-12-19 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2014-12-19 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-1 And Full Title |
2014-12-19 | House | Retransmitted |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Roll Call # 922 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-12-19 | Senate | House Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-12-19 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute H-4 To Senate Substitute S-1 |
2014-12-19 | House | Title Amended |
2014-12-19 | House | Roll Call # 781 Yeas 87 Nays 23 |
2014-12-19 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In As Substituted H-4 |
2014-12-19 | House | Substitute H-4 Adopted |
2014-06-12 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2014-06-12 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 447 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vote Reconsidered |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reconsider Vote Postponed |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Defeated Roll Call # 446 Yeas 18 Nays 19 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Infrastructure Modernization |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 84 Nays 25 |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2014-05-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2014-04-30 | House | Printed Bill Filed 04/30/2014 |
2014-04-29 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2014-04-29 | House | Read A First Time |
2014-04-29 | House | Introduced By Representative Rob Verheulen |