MI HB5485 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; criminal procedure; juvenile competency definitions; clarify. Amends sec. 1, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5484'09, HB 5486'09, HB 5487'09, HB 5488'09, HB 5489'09
Title
Juveniles; criminal procedure; juvenile competency definitions; clarify. Amends sec. 1, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1). TIE BAR WITH: HB 5484'09, HB 5486'09, HB 5487'09, HB 5488'09, HB 5489'09
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Bauer [D] | Rep. Pamela Byrnes [D] | Rep. Hugh Crawford [R] | Rep. Jennifer Haase [D] |
Rep. Eileen Kowall [R] | Rep. Ellen Lipton [D] | Rep. Lesia Liss [D] | Rep. Kate Segal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 | |
2009-09-30 | Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2009 | |
2009-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-29 | Introduced By Representative Ellen Lipton |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-5485 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-5485.htm |