MI HB5483 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred To Second Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; criminal procedure; restoration of juvenile to competency to proceed; clarify. Amends sec. 1, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1) & adds sec. 18s.
Title
Juveniles; criminal procedure; restoration of juvenile to competency to proceed; clarify. Amends sec. 1, ch. XIIA of 1939 PA 288 (MCL 712A.1) & adds sec. 18s.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-09-30 | Printed Bill Filed 09/30/2009 | |
2009-09-29 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | |
2009-09-29 | Read A First Time | |
2009-09-29 | Introduced By Representative Eileen Kowall |
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2009-HB-5483 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2009-2010/billintroduced/House/htm/2009-HIB-5483.htm |